MS SB2605 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Codify Section 25-43-1.108, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require A Regulatory Reduction Program For The Mississippi Commission On Environmental Quality As A Pilot Agency; To Provide That The Mississippi Commission On Environmental Quality Shall Not Adopt A New Regulatory Requirement Unless It Simultaneously Removes Two Or More Other Existing Regulatory Requirements; To Require The Mississippi Commission On Environmental Quality And Any Other Pilot Agency To Report To The Peer Committee; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Regulatory reduction program for Commission on Environmental Quality; provide pilot program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-09 | House | DR - TSDPAA: CR To AC |
2020-06-09 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AC To CR |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Conservation and Water Resources |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-27 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: EP To AC |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Environment Prot, Cons and Water Res;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |