MS SB2603 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-11-551, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize An Insurer To Direct An Auction Firm Or Automotive Dismantler To Release A Vehicle To The Vehicle's Owner Or Lienholder When The Insurer Does Not Take Ownership Of The Vehicle; To Require Notice To The Owner And Lienholder That The Vehicle Is Available For Pick Up; To Provide For A Lien-free Salvage Certificate Of Title Or A Parts-only Certificate Of Title To An Auction Firm Or Automotive Dismantler If The Owner Or Lienholder Does Not Pick Up The Vehicle Within A Certain Number Of Days; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Salvage or abandoned vehicles; authorize disposition by auction firms on behalf of insurers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed |
2021-03-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Insurance |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |