MS SB2596 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 67-1-81, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Penalties For The Sale Or Furnishing Of Alcoholic Beverages To A Minor, And To Authorize The Commissioner Of Revenue To Impose Certain Administrative Penalties On Alcoholic Beverage Permittees For Violations Of This Section; To Create New Section 97-32-52, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Declare As Unlawful, And To Provide The Penalties For, The Sale Or Furnishing Of An Alternative Nicotine Product To A Minor Within 1,500 Feet Of A Building On Educational Property, Or Within 1,000 Feet Of A Church, Public Park, Ballpark, Public Gymnasium, Youth Center Or Movie Theater ; To Amend Section 97-32-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of "alternative Nicotine Product," And To Revise The Penalties And Age Limit For Offenses Concerning The Distribution Of Alternative Nicotine Products To Minors; To Amend Section 97-32-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Penalties And Age Limit For The Purchase And Possession Of Tobacco By Minors, And To Expand The Prohibitions To The Purchase And Possession Of Alternative Nicotine Products; To Amend Sections 97-32-7, 97-32-13 And 97-32-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Above; To Amend Section 97-32-2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Statewide Uniformity With Respect To Certain Laws Concerning The Sale, Promotion And Distribution Of Alternative Nicotine Products, Tobacco And Tobacco Products; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; revise penalties for sale to minors.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 45 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08 Approved by Governor
2020-07-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-29SenateConference Report Adopted
2020-06-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-06-27HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-27SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-26HouseConferees Named Bain,Yates,Sanford
2020-06-24SenateConferees Named Harkins,Boyd,DeLano
2020-06-23SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-17HouseReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-16HousePassed As Amended
2020-06-16HouseAmended
2020-06-09HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-06-09HouseDR - TSDPAA: WM To JB
2020-06-09HouseDR - TSDPAA: JB To WM
2020-03-25HouseReferred To Judiciary B;Ways and Means
2020-03-13SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-11SenatePassed As Amended
2020-03-11SenateAmended
2020-02-27SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-02-17SenateReferred To Finance

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/SB/SB2596.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2500-2599/SB2596IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2500-2599/SB2596PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2500-2599/SB2596SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/SB2596_S_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/ham/SB2596_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/ham/SB2596_H_Amend_02.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/0650007.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1620033.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1740011.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1750028.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback