MS SB2596 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create Section 63-7-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Use Of Nitrous Oxide In Any Motor Vehicle Or Motorcycle Driven On The Streets Or Highways And To Prescribe Penalties For The Use Of Nitrous Oxide In Motor Vehicles Or Motorcycles Driven On The Streets Or Highways; To Create New Section 63-3-502, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Racing In A Motor Vehicle Or Motorcycle On Streets Or Highways; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public streets and highways; prohibit racing and use of nitrous oxide.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-23 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 107 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 107 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-26 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-25 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-23 | Concurred in Amend From House | |
2010-03-10 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Amended | |
2010-03-02 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-11 | Referred To Transportation | |
2010-02-09 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-08 | Passed | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-14 | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |