MS SB2595 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That A Governmental Entity May Not Prohibit An Individual From Wearing Traditional Tribal Regalia Or Objects Of Cultural Significance At A Public Event; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Governmental entities; may not prohibit wearing of traditional tribal regalia or objects of cultural significance at public events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-17 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed |
2020-06-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Passed |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |