MS SB2588 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create New Section 23-15-152, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The County Registrar Or County Election Commission Shall Remove From The Statewide Elections Management System Those Electors Who Fail To Respond To A Confirmation Notice For A Period Of Consecutive Years; To Define The Terms "confirmation Notice" And "fail To Respond To The Conformation Notice"; To Require Election Commissioners To Send Registered Electors Who Do Not Vote For A Certain Period A Confirmation Notice; To Provide The Time For Removal Of Voter Registration Records; To Provide For The Retention Of Removed Voter Registration Records; To Amend Sections 23-15-125 And 23-15-153, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Statewide Elections Management System; remove electors who fail to respond to notice.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseDied In Committee
2021-02-24HouseReferred To Apportionment and Elections
2021-02-16SenateTransmitted To House
2021-02-15SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2021-02-10SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2021-02-10SenatePassed
2021-02-10SenateAmendment Failed
2021-02-10SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2021-01-26SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2021-01-18SenateReferred To Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2315125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2315153Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback