MS SB2587 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 23-15-637, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Registrar To Alphabetize Received Absentee Ballots; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Absentee ballots; authorize registrar to alphabetize and sort by precinct.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-02HouseDied In Committee
2021-02-24HouseReferred To Apportionment and Elections
2021-02-11SenateTransmitted To House
2021-02-10SenatePassed
2021-02-10SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2021-01-26SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2021-01-18SenateReferred To Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2315637Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback