MS SB2577 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Motor Vehicle Tax And License Synchronization Study Committee To Examine And Develop Recommendations Regarding The Feasibility Of Adopting Certain Statewide Measures For Streamlining The Payment Of Motor Vehicle Ad Valorem Taxes And Road And Bridge Privilege Taxes And The Issuance Of License Tags Through The Dealership At The Time Of A Motor Vehicle Purchase; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Motor Vehicle Tax and License Synchronization Study Committee; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-11 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed |
2019-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Amended |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Finance |