MS SB2570 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of First Responders Of Mississippi, The Belhaven Improvement Association, The Jefferson Davis County School District, Canopy Children's Solutions, The Mississippi Kidney Foundation, The Mississippi Faculty Association Of Community And Junior Colleges, The Mississippi Sweet Potato Council, The Family Resource Center Of North Mississippi, Ingalls Shipbuilding, The Rotary Club Of Central Hancock County, Starkville High School, Camp Pioneer, Inc., The Marty Wilson Foundation One Gulf One Goal, Columbus High School, Ronald Mcdonald House Charities Of Mississippi, Inc., The Celtic Heritage Society, Suicide Prevention, The Moss Point School District, The Mississippi Book Festival, The North Panola School District, The Holly Springs Separate School District, And The Dixie National Rodeo; To Prescribe An Additional Fee For The Issuance Of Such License Tags; To Provide For The Distribution Of The Additional Fees Collected; To Amend Section 27-19-44, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt License Tags For Supporters Of The Dixie National Rodeo From The Requirement That A Certain Number Of Such Tags Must Be Purchased Prior To Issuance; To Authorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags With The Stennis Flag Designed By Laurin Stennis Imprinted Thereon; To Amend Section 27-19-56.15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reauthorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags That Display The Emblems Of Universities Located In Other States; To Provide That A Portion Of The Fees Collected From The Issuance Of Distinctive License Tags Displaying The Emblem Of Florida State University Shall Be Distributed To The Florida State University Veterans Alliance Fund; To Amend Section 27-19-56.108, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reauthorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Rotary International; To Amend Section 27-19-56.315, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reauthorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Juvenile Diabetes Foundation; To Amend Section 27-19-56.402, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reauthorize The Issuance Of The Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags For Supporters Of Children's Advocacy Centers Of Mississippi; To Amend Section 27-19-56.314, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Period Of Time During Which The Requirements May Be Met For Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags For Supporters Of The Mind Center At The University Of Mississippi Medical Center; To Amend Section 27-19-56.342, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reauthorize The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of Callaway High School; To Amend Section 27-19-56.313, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Distribution Of Fees Collected From The Issuance Of Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tags To Supporters Of The Pearl River Valley Water Supply District; To Amend Section 27-19-53, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Number Of Disabled Veteran Motor Vehicle License Tags That May Be Issued To A Disabled Veteran And To Increase The Number Of Vehicles Of Such A Disabled Veteran Who Is Exempt From Ad Valorem And Privilege Taxes; To Amend Section 27-19-56.162, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Persons To Whom The Gold Star Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tag May Be Issued, To Provide That The Tag May Be Issued To Family Members Of Service Members Who Have Died While Serving On Active Duty In The Armed Forces Of The United States While The United States Was Engaged In Hostile Activities Or A Time Of War; To Amend Section 27-51-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Amend Section 27-19-56.186, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Issuance Of The Iraq Veteran Distinctive Motor Vehicle License Tag To Persons Who Are Recipients Of The Inherent Resolve Campaign Medal; To Amend Section 27-19-52, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Senior Judges On Senior Status Within The Members Of The State Judiciary Who May Apply For Motor Vehicle License Tags Issued By The Department Of Revenue That Cannot Be Traced Except By Law Enforcement Agencies For Certain Purposes; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Distinctive motor vehicle license tag; revise persons eligible to be issued the Gold Star license tag.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16 Approved by Governor
2019-04-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-04-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-28SenateConference Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseConference Report Filed
2019-03-27SenateConference Report Filed
2019-03-25HouseConferees Named Smith,Lamar,Zuber
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Fillingane,Kirby,Blackmon
2019-03-21SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-11HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-07HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-07HouseAmended
2019-03-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Ways and Means
2019-02-12SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-08SenatePassed As Amended
2019-02-08SenateAmended
2019-02-08SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Finance

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/SB/SB2570.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2500-2599/SB2570IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2500-2599/SB2570CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2500-2599/SB2570PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2500-2599/SB2570SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/SB2570_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2570_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0320003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0590006.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0800043.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0800103.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback