MS SB2564 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 75-67-329, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Procedure For The Confiscation Of Pledged Or Purchased Goods From A Pawnshop; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Pawnshops; revise procedure for the confiscation of pledged goods by law enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Failed (Y: 23 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Failed |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Amended |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |