MS SB2563 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Enact The Mississippi Pill Press Law Of 2022; To Criminalize The Unauthorized Possession And Transfer Of A Pill Press; To Include Similar Devices Within The Offense; To Provide A Penalty For Violation; To Require Registration With The Mississippi Bureau Of Narcotics, Unless The Pill Press Is Authorized By The Board Of Pharmacy Or Other Lawful Entity; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Pill Press Law of 2022; enact.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Sparks [R] | Sen. Nicole Boyd [R] | Sen. Jeff Tate [R] | Sen. Michael McLendon [R] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Died On Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |