MS SB2551 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 93-1-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Judges Of The United States District Courts For The Northern Or Southern Districts Of Mississippi To Solemnize Rites Of Matrimony Anywhere In The State; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solemnize marriage; authorize certain federal judges to perform rites.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 25 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09HouseDied In Committee
2020-03-17HouseReferred To Judiciary A
2020-03-11SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-11SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2020-03-06SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2020-03-05SenatePassed
2020-03-05SenateMotion to Recommit Lost
2020-02-25SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-02-17SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback