MS SB2537 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 45-13-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reduce A Violation Of The Article That Regulates The Sale And Storage Of Fireworks From A Felony To A Misdemeanor; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Fireworks; reduce offense for violation of law from felony to misdemeanor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Died On Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |