MS SB2528 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Prohibit Unlawful Disclosure Or Promotion Of Intimate Visual Material; To Create New Section 95-17-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Definitions; To Create New Section 95-17-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Liability For Unlawful Disclosure Or Promotion Of Certain Visual Material; To Create New Section 95-17-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Damages; To Create New Section 95-17-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Injunctive Relief; To Create New Section 95-17-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Remedies Under This Act Are Cumulative To Other Law; To Create New Section 95-17-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Jurisdiction; To Create New Section 95-17-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Exceptions; To Create New Section 97-29-67, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create The Crime Of Unlawful Disclosure Or Promotion Of Intimate Visual Material, And To Enact Definitions And Penalties; To Create The Act Of "sexting" As A Delinquent Act Within The Original Jurisdiction Of The Youth Court, To Create Certain Exceptions, And To Create Defenses; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Intimate visual material; create civil and criminal liability for unlawful disclosure or promotion of.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseTabled
2019-02-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-20HouseReferred To Judiciary A
2019-02-19SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-14SenatePassed As Amended
2019-02-14SenateAmended
2019-01-29SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback