MS SB2524 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-144-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add A Licensed Psychiatrist As A Member Of The Mississippi Rural Physicians Scholarship Commission; To Amend Section 37-144-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include The American Psychiatric Association Among The Organizations From Which The Commission Shall Seek Input Regarding The Implementation Of The Mississippi Rural Physicians Scholarship Program; To Amend Section 37-144-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Commission To Grant An Exception For Fourth-year Medical School Students Who Demonstrate A Desire To Practice Psychiatry In Rural Mississippi And Who Use A Practice Model And Enter The Practice Of Medicine In A Rural Or Underserved Area In Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Rural Physicians Scholarship Residency Program; include psychiatry students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-14 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2019-03-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Lamar, Mims, Johnson (87th)) |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | Read the Third Time |
2019-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-27 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To PH |
2019-02-27 | House | DR - TSDPAA: PH To AP |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services;Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Amended |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-29 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: PH To AP |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Appropriations |