MS SB2522 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Referred To Workforce Development;Judiciary A
Pending: House Workforce Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Provide That No Employer Shall Pay An Employee A Wage At A Rate Less Than The Rate At Which An Employee Of The Opposite Sex In The Same Establishment Is Paid For Equal Work On A Job, The Performance Of Which Requires Equal Skill, Effort, Education, Experience And Responsibility, And Which Is Performed Under Similar Working Conditions; To Provide That An Employee May File A Petition In The Proper Circuit Court; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equal pay for equal work; require for employees of opposite sex in the same work establishment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseReferred To Workforce Development;Judiciary A
2020-03-16SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-12SenatePassed As Amended
2020-03-12SenateAmended
2020-03-12SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-03-03SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-03-03SenateDR - TSDPCS: AC To JA
2020-02-27SenateDR - TSDP: JA To AC
2020-02-17SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/SB/SB2522.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2500-2599/SB2522IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2500-2599/SB2522CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2500-2599/SB2522PS.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/SB2522_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/SB2522_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/SB2522_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_03.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/SB2522_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_04.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/0660051.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback