MS SB2508 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 37-159-1, 37-159-5, 37-159-7, 37-159-9, 37-159-11, 37-159-13 And 37-159-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Individual Automatic Repealers On The Provisions That Constitute The "mississippi Critical Teacher Shortage Act Of 1998"; To Create New Section 37-159-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of Repeal On Sections 37-159-1 Through 37-159-17; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Provisions of the Mississippi Critical Teacher Shortage Act of 1998; extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-03 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-02 | House | Passed |
2020-05-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Education |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Education |