MS SB2507 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 57-1-16, 57-1-221 And 57-93-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow Businesses Located On Tribal Lands Within The Geographical Boundary Of Mississippi To Be Eligible For Mississippi Development Authority Discretionary Programs Through The Ace Fund, The Industry Incentive Financing Revolving Fund And The Existing Industry Productivity Loan Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Development Authority; allow businesses located on tribal lands to be eligible for certain discretionary programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Died On Calendar |
2021-03-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2021-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
57 | 1 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 93 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |