MS SB2506 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Failed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-7-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide An Open Season On Harvesting Deer With Bow And Arrow On The Last Friday, Saturday And Sunday Between September 10th And 20th, Provided That Only Legal Bucks May Be Harvested Through Traditional Archery Or Crossbow Only, On Private And Wildlife Management Area Lands; To Require Reporting Of The Harvested Animals; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bow hunting; establish a three-day season the last weekend between September 10th and 20th for legal bucks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 111 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2022-03-23 | House | Conferees Named Kinkade,Barnett,Lamar |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Whaley,McCaughn,Michel |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Amendment Failed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |