MS SB2506 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-7-104.4, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reconstitute The Membership Of The Winona-montgomery School District Board Of Trustees; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Winona-Montgomery School Board of Trustees; revise membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-03 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-02 | House | Passed |
2020-05-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Education |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Education |