MS SB2499 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 17-17-3 And Bring Forward Sections 17-17-205 And 17-17-305, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Definitions Of Terms Under The Solid Waste Disposal Law For Advanced Plastic Recycling Processes, Facilities And Products; To Conform The Power And Duties Of The Executive Secretary Of The Mississippi Department Of Environmental Quality; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Solid Waste Disposal Law; define advanced plastic recycling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named McDaniel,DeLano,Thompson |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-03-01 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-02-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Conservation and Water Resources |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-27 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: EP To BF |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Environment Prot, Cons and Water Res;Business and Financial Institutions |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 17 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 17 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 17 | 305 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |