MS SB2491 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 9-23-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Time Frame Within Which The Certification And Recertification Of Drug Courts Will Occur So As To Alternate Between Even And Odd Years To Better Distribute The Workload Of The Administrative Office Of Courts And Increase The Effectiveness And Efficiency Of The Review Process; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug courts; revise time frame of recertification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Approved by Governor
2019-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-13HouseReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-12HousePassed
2019-02-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Judiciary A
2019-02-07SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-06SenatePassed
2019-01-29SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback