MS SB2484 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-61-65, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require A Forensic Pathologist To Be Designated By The State Medical Examiner For A Certain Portion Of The State; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Medical examiner; require appointment in southern region.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Tindell [R] | Sen. Thomas Gollott [R] | Sen. Philip Moran [R] | Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] |
Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] | Sen. Tony Smith [R] | Sen. Michael Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | Died In Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Passed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |