MS SB2481 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 9, Chapter 450, Laws Of 2020, To Revise The Designation Of A Segment Of Mississippi Highway 42 In Greene County, Mississippi, As The "deputy U.s. Marshal Jake Green And Greene County Deputy Lawrence Dunnam Memorial Highway, Eow April 1, 1921"; To Designate A Segment Of Mississippi Highway 389 In Chickasaw County, Mississippi, As The "jimmy Porter Memorial Highway"; To Designate A Segment Of U.s. Highway 49 In Hattiesburg, Forrest County, Mississippi, As The "clyde Kennard Memorial Highway"; To Designate A Segment Of Mississippi Highway 489 In Newton County, Mississippi, As The "jason Boyd Memorial Highway"; To Designate A Segment Of U.s. Highway 82 In Leflore County, Mississippi, As The "deputy Melvin P. 'buster' Brown, Jr., Memorial Highway"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Memorial highways; designate various segments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-09 | House | Amended |
2021-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-03-02 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To TR |
2021-02-25 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To AP |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred To Transportation;Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |