MS SB2478 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Consideration Of The Deployment, Implementation Or Use Of A Motor Carrier Safety Improvement, By Or As Required By A Motor Carrier Or Its Related Entity, Including By Contract, In The Evaluation Of An Individual's Status As An Employee, Independent Contractor Or Jointly Employed Employee Under Any State Law; To Amend Section 77-7-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Term "motor Carrier Safety Improvement"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Motor carrier safety improvements; prohibit consideration of use in evaluation of employment status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | House | Died On Calendar |
2021-03-09 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Busby, Massengill) |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed |
2021-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Transportation |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |