MS SB2465 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-75-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide An Insurance Premium Discount Or Reduction For Homeowners Who Build A New Home Within The State That Better Resists Tornado Or Other Catastrophic Windstorm Events; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Homeowners insurance; require premium discount for new home tornado mitigation construction in any county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 108 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-22 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Insurance |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |