MS SB2460 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 43-21-353 And 43-47-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Persons Who Make Reports To The Department Of Child Protection Services And The Department Of Human Services About The Suspected Neglect Or Abuse Of A Child Or The Suspected Abuse, Neglect Or Exploitation Of A Vulnerable Person To Provide Their Name, Address And Telephone Number To The Department; To Provide That The Name, Address And Telephone Number Of The Person Who Made The Report Shall Be Redacted From All Records In Connection With The Case After The Case Is Closed; To Provide That In Cases Of Reports Of Child Abuse Or Neglect To The Department Of Child Protection Services, If The Department Determines That A Parent Or Other Person Responsible For The Care Or Welfare Of An Abused Or Neglected Child Maintains Active Duty Status Within The Military, Then The Department Shall Notify The Applicable Military Installation Family Advocacy Program That There Is An Allegation Of Abuse Or Neglect That Relates To That Child; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Child abuse; require CPS to notify applicable military installation family advocacy program in certain cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Vetoed | |
2018-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2018-03-01 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-02-28 | House | Amended |
2018-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |