MS SB2458 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate A Portion Of Mississippi Highway 1 In Washington County, Mississippi, As "sonny Merideth Memorial Highway"; To Designate A Segment Of U.s. Highway 82 In Leflore County, Mississippi, As The "yanky 72 Memorial Highway" In Honor Of The Marines And The Navy Corpsman Who Were Killed In The Crash Of A Kc-130 Aircraft On July 10, 2017; To Designate A Portion Of U.s. Highway 51 In Grenada County, Mississippi, As "agent Lee Tartt Memorial Highway"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Memorial highways; designate various portions of highways as.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Willie Simmons [D] | Sen. Thomas Gollott [R] |
Sen. Bob Dearing [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-23 | House | Conferees Named Busby,McGee,Arnold |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Conferees Named Simmons (13th),Witherspoon,Clarke |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-07 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-06 | House | Amended |
2018-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-27 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To TR |
2018-02-21 | House | DR - TSDPAA: TR To AP |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Transportation;Appropriations |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |