MS SB2453 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize Sheriffs To Employ Personnel To Provide Occupational Health Services, Preventative Primary Care And Acute Care To Sheriff Employees And Their Dependents; To Authorize The Adoption Of Standards For The Provision Of Occupational Health Services; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sheriffs; authorize to provide occupational health services and preventive care to employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Died In Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred To County Affairs;Insurance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To County Affairs |