MS SB2452 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Due From Governor 04/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Due From Governor 04/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-7-307, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify That Local School Districts May Deduct The Cost Of A Substitute Teacher From The Salary Of A Licensed School Employee For The First 10 Days Of Absence Due To Sick Leave In Excess Of The Employee's Sick Leave Allowance, And Shall Withhold The Salary Of Such Licensed Employee For Days Of Absence In Excess Of Said 10 Days; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Employment of substitute teachers; clarify deduction of cost of substitutes from pay of absent licensee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Due From Governor 04/23/12 | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-11 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-04-10 | Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-19 | Referred To Education | |
2012-03-09 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-08 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-08 | Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-03-06 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-02-16 | Referred To Education |