MS SB2450 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-34-4, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Annually Divert Monies Derived From The Nonadmitted Policy Fee To The State And School Insurance Fund; To Provide That Such Monies Shall Not Be Transferred If The Value Of The Mississippi Windstorm Underwriting Association's Total Admitted Assets Is Less Than A Certain Amount; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Windstorm Underwriting Association; divert nonadmitted policy fee to the State and School Employees' Insurance Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Insurance |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |