MS SB2449 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 43-21-321, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Responsibility Of The Home School District And The Sponsoring School District To Provide Education For Students In Juvenile Detention Facilities, To Require Local School Districts To Provide Relevant Records Of Detained Students In Accordance With State Board Of Education Policy, To Provide For A Required Summer Course For Such Students Focusing On Mathematics And Language Arts And To Authorize The State Department Of Education To Promulgate Rules And Regulations Related To The Education Of Children Housed In A Juvenile Detention Facility; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education of students in juvenile detention facilities; define responsibility of home school district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29 Approved by Governor
2019-03-26HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-26SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21SenateConcurred in Amend From House
2019-03-14HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-12HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-12HouseAmended
2019-03-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-03-05HouseDR - TSDPAA: AP To ED
2019-03-04HouseDR - TSDPAA: ED To AP
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Education;Appropriations
2019-02-12SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-11SenatePassed
2019-02-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-30SenateDR - TSDP: ED To AP
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Education;Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback