MS SB2448 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 43-11-1 And 43-11-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Term "special Care Facility For Paroled Inmates" And Prescribe Conditions For Licensure By The State Department Of Health; To Amend Sections 47-5-28 And 47-7-4, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Mississippi Department Of Corrections To Establish A Program To Grant Medical Parole To Such Special Care Facility For Medically Frail Inmates And To Establish Eligibility Requirements For Such Parole; To Codify Section 43-13-117.6, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize And Direct The Division Of Medicaid To Apply For Necessary Waivers For Medicaid Reimbursement For Services Provided At Such Special Care Facility For Paroled Inmates; To Amend Section 41-7-191, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The State Department Of Health To Issue A Health Care Certificate Of Need For The Construction, Conversion And Operation Of A Special Care Facility For Paroled Inmates; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Special Care Facility for Paroled Inmates; authorize parole for medically frail inmates, licensure and Medicaid reimbursement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred To Medicaid |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Medicaid |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 7 | 191 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 11 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 11 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |