MS SB2447 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Codify Section 37-153-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Career And Technical Education Grants Through The State Board Of Education And The State Workforce Investment Board (swib) To Schools For Each Student Who Earns A Qualifying Industry Certification; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Career and technical grants to schools for qualified students; provide for.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | Amended |
2019-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-03-05 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To ED |
2019-03-04 | House | DR - TSDPAA: ED To AP |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-30 | Senate | DR - TSDP: ED To AP |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |