MS SB2444 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 31-2)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 37-19-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Minimum Teacher Salary Scale By Increasing The Minimum Salary For The 2022-2023 School Year; To Set The Minimum Teacher Salary For The 2023-2024 School Year And Subsequent School Years; To Delete The Cap On The Number Of National Board-certified Nurses And Speech-language Pathologists And Audiologists Employed By Schools Districts Who Are Allowed To Receive The Salary Supplement For National Board Certification; To Require The Payment Of An Annual Salary Supplement To State-licensed Athletic Trainers Employed By A School District Who Have Acquired National Board Certification; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers' salaries; provide increase to minimum salary.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-01HouseDied In Committee
2022-02-03HouseReferred To Education;Appropriations
2022-02-03SenateTransmitted To House
2022-02-02SenatePassed
2022-02-02SenateReconsidered
2022-01-24SenateRecalled From House
2022-01-24SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2022-01-21HouseReferred To Education;Appropriations
2022-01-21SenateTransmitted To House
2022-01-21SenateImmediate Release
2022-01-21SenatePassed
2022-01-21SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2022-01-20SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2022-01-20SenateDR - TSDPCS: ED To AP
2022-01-17SenateReferred To Education;Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37197Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback