MS SB2439 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-65-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend Until July 1, 2022, The Sales Tax Exemption On Sales Of Equipment To Telecommunications Enterprises That Is Used In The Deployment Of Broadband Technologies; To Amend Section 57-87-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend Until July 1, 2022, The Income And Franchise Tax Credits Granted To Telecommunications Enterprises For The Cost Of Equipment Used In The Deployment Of Broadband Technologies; To Amend Section 57-87-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend Until July 1, 2022, The Ad Valorem Tax Exemption For Equipment Used In The Deployment Of Broadband Technologies By Telecommunications Enterprises; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Taxation; extend exemptions and credits for certain equipment used in the deployment of broadband technologies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Died In Committee |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Finance |