MS SB2434 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Sales Tax Taxation Of Construction-related Activities Study Committee To Examine And Develop Recommendations For The Taxation Of Certain Construction-related Activities In Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sales Tax Taxation of Construction-Related Activities Study Committee; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-16 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2020-06-11 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-10 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-10 | House | Amended |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-03-13 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Amended |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Finance |