MS SB2427 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Referred To Banking and Financial Services
Pending: House Banking and Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Reenact Sections 81-18-1 Through 81-18-63, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Known As The Mississippi S.a.f.e. Mortgage Act; To Amend Reenacted Section 81-18-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend And Clarify The Time Period During Which Mortgage Brokers Are Required To Maintain Their Books, Accounts And Records; To Amend Reenacted Section 81-18-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Type Of Estimate Of Costs Provided To The Borrower; To Repeal Section 81-18-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides The Date Of Repeal On The Provisions Of Law Known As The Mississippi S.a.f.e. Mortgage Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MS S.A.F.E. Mortgage Act; remove repealer, clarify record keeping requirements, clarify estimate of costs provided to borrower.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseReferred To Banking and Financial Services
2020-03-06SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-05SenatePassed
2020-02-27SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-02-14SenateReferred To Business and Financial Institutions

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback