MS SB2424 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-9-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That School Districts Shall Process A Single Monthly Or Bimonthly Payroll For Employees In The Discretion Of The Local School Board; To Amend Section 37-151-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require All School Districts To Process A Single Monthly Or Bimonthly Payroll For All Employees In The Discretion Of The Local School Board; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School district employee payroll; allow monthly or bimonthly payments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Bennett,McCarty,Owen |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named DeBar,Blount,Johnson |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-11 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-09 | House | Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2022-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-02 | House | Referred To Education |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Education |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 151 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 9 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |