MS SB2423 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 75-71-412, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Grounds For Discipline For Violations Of The Mississippi Securities Act; To Amend Section 75-71-701, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Applicability Of The Predecessor Act To Pending Proceedings And Existing Rights; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Securities Act; clarify grounds for discipline for violations of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-07 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-06 | House | Passed |
2017-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred To Banking and Financial Services |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |