MS SB2420 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 73-54-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Board Of Examiners For Social Workers And Marriage And Family Therapists To Issue A Temporary License To Out-of-state Licensees To Practice In A Nonprofit Health Care/counseling Facility; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Temporary license for social workers; authorize to practice in nonprofit facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2021-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-08 | House | Amended |
2021-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |