MS SB2408 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 75-29-951, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Maximum Annual Gross Sales For A Cottage Food Operation From Twenty Thousand Dollars To Thirty-five Thousand Dollars To Be Exempt From Food Establishment Permit Fees; To Authorize A Cottage Food Operation To Advertise Cottage Food Products Over The Internet, Including Through Social Media; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Cottage food operation; increase maximum annual gross sales to $50,000.00 and authorize to advertise over the internet.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-24 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: AG To FI |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Agriculture;Finance |