MS SB2398 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-235, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Limitation On The Number Of Poll Managers Which May Be Appointed By Local Election Commissioners; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Poll managers; remove limitation on number which may be appointed by local election commissioners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-09 | House | DR - TSDP: AE To CA |
2020-06-09 | House | DR - TSDP: CA To AE |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To County Affairs;Apportionment and Elections |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred To Elections |