MS SB2398 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 37-9-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Qualifications For Selection Of Superintendents Of School Districts; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Qualifications for school superintendents; revise.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 69 N: 50 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 63 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-18 Approved by Governor
2017-04-03HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-04-03SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-29HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2017-03-28HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Moore, Roberson, Baria)
2017-03-28SenateConference Report Adopted
2017-03-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2017-03-27HouseConference Report Filed
2017-03-27SenateConference Report Filed
2017-03-26HouseConferees Named Moore,Roberson,Boyd
2017-03-24SenateConferees Named Tollison,Wiggins,Polk
2017-03-21SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2017-03-09HouseReturned For Concurrence
2017-03-09HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2017-03-07HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Calhoun, Moore, Roberson)
2017-03-07HousePassed As Amended
2017-03-07HouseAmended
2017-02-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2017-02-21HouseReferred To Education
2017-02-03SenateTransmitted To House
2017-02-02SenatePassed
2017-02-02SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2017-01-25SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2017-01-16SenateReferred To Education

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/history/SB/SB2398.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/SB/2300-2399/SB2398IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/SB/2300-2399/SB2398CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/SB/2300-2399/SB2398PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/SB/2300-2399/SB2398SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/ham/SB2398_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/ham/SB2398_H_Amend_01_to_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/ham/SB2398_H_Amend_02_to_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/senate/0310039.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/house/0640010.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/house/0850022.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/votes/senate/0850057.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback