MS SB2398 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 29-3-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Exchange Of Multiple Parcels Of Forested Sixteenth Section Lieu Land For Significant Timber Management, Research And Development; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sixteenth section lieu land; authorize exchange for timber development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-06 Approved by Governor
2016-03-31HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2016-03-31SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2016-03-30HouseReturned For Enrolling
2016-03-30HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2016-03-29HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Frierson, Huddleston (15th))
2016-03-29HousePassed
2016-03-25HouseRead the Third Time
2016-03-22HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2016-03-14HouseReferred To Appropriations
2016-03-01SenateTransmitted To House
2016-02-29SenatePassed
2016-02-29SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2016-02-23SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2016-02-08SenateReferred To Education

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback