MS SB2398 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 25-11-401, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Teaching Or Administrative Faculty Positions That Are Eligible For The Optional Retirement Program Shall Be As Defined In The Plan Document; To Amend Section 25-11-409, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Participant In The Optional Retirement Program May Irrevocably Elect To Change His Or Her Election And Join The Public Employees' Retirement System Before The Fifth Annual Anniversary Of The Person's Initial Enrollment In The Optional Retirement Program; To Provide That Any Employee Who Before July 1, 2015, Elected To Participate In The Optional Retirement Program Shall Have A One-time Opportunity To Irrevocably Change His Or Her Election And Prospectively Participate In The Public Employees' Retirement System If The Election Is Filed With The System On Or Before December 31, 2016; To Authorize Persons Making Such Election To Purchase Service Credit For Their Prior Years Of Service During Which They Participated In The Optional Retirement Program; To Amend Section 25-11-411, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove Certain Unnecessary Language; To Amend Section 25-11-413, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That, Except As Otherwise Provided In This Act, An Employee Who Participates In The Optional Retirement Program For 90 Days Or More And Is Subsequently Employed In A Position That Is Not Otherwise Eligible For The Program Shall Not Be Eligible For Participation In The Public Employees' Retirement System And Shall Continue To Be Eligible For Participation In The Program So Long As The Employee Meets The Other Eligibility Requirement For The Program, Except As Otherwise Provided In This Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Optional retirement program; authorize participants to join PERS under certain circumstances.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-03SenateDied In Committee
2015-01-19SenateReferred To Finance

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback