MS SB2398 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 17 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-17 - Due From Governor 04/23/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The "mississippi Small Business Regulatory Flexibility Act"; To Define Certain Terms As Used In The Act; To Establish A Small Business Regulatory Review Committee; To Improve State Rulemaking By Creating Procedures To Analyze The Economic Impact On And Availability Of More Flexible Approaches For Small Business; To Amend Section 25-43-3.105, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require That Each Agency Proposing Any Amendment To A Rule Under The Administrative Procedures Law To Consider The Economic Impact Of The Amendment; To Provide That The Required Written Report Providing An Economic Impact Statement For The Adoption Of A Rule Shall Include The Specific Legal Authority For The Adoption Of The Rule And A Statement Of The Effect The Proposed Action Will Have On The Public Health, Safety And Welfare; To Provide That The Full Text Of The Economic Impact Statement Must Be Filed With The Secretary Of State For Publication In The Administrative Bulletin And To Remove Certain Exemptions From The Requirements Of This Section; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Small Business Regulatory Flexibility Act; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-17 Due From Governor 04/23/12
2012-04-17 Enrolled Bill Signed
2012-04-17 Enrolled Bill Signed
2012-04-12 Transmitted To Senate
2012-04-11 Passed
2012-04-11 Tabled Subject To Call
2012-04-10 Set Aside-Pending Fiscal Note
2012-03-29 Title Suff Do Pass
2012-03-29 DR - TSDP: AC To WD
2012-03-29 DR - TSDP: WD To AC
2012-03-19 Referred To Workforce Development;S.C. Accountblty/Efficiency/Transparency
2012-03-15 Transmitted To House
2012-03-13 Passed
2012-03-13 Committee Substitute Adopted
2012-02-23 Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2012-02-13 Referred To Finance

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback