MS SB2398 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 83-64-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Repealer On The Requirements For Health Discount Plans; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health discount plans; extend repealer on requirements for.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-02-25 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Died On Calendar
2010-02-26 Returned For Concurrence
2010-02-25 Passed As Amended
2010-02-25 Amended
2010-02-17 Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
2010-02-09 Referred To Insurance
2010-02-04 Transmitted To House
2010-02-03 Passed
2010-01-21 Title Suff Do Pass
2010-01-11 Referred To Insurance

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback