MS SB2393 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-79-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Policy For The Possession And Self-administration Of Prescription Asthma And/or Anaphylaxis Medication By Public And Nonpublic School Students While On School Property Or At School Activities; To Require The State Department Of Education To Require All School Districts To Take Certain Actions Relating To Children With Asthma; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Self-administration of prescription asthma/anaphylaxis medication by students; clarify policy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-23 | Conferees Named Brown,Ward,Holland | |
2010-03-18 | Conferees Named Carmichael,Jordan,King | |
2010-03-18 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-18 | Reconsidered | |
2010-03-17 | Concurred in Amend From House | |
2010-03-10 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Amended | |
2010-03-02 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-25 | DR - TSDPAA: PH To ED | |
2010-02-24 | DR - TSDPAA: ED To PH | |
2010-02-09 | Referred To Education;Public Health and Human Services | |
2010-02-05 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-03 | Amended | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-11 | Referred To Education |