MS SB2392 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-103-159, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Modify Certain Definitions Relating To The Identification And Inventorying Of Programs Used In The Budgeting Process; To Expand The Scope Of Agencies That May Be Required To Participate In The Process; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State budget; revise definition for identifying and inventorying programs used in the budgeting process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2019-03-07 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-06 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-06 | House | Amended |
2019-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |